## 3 Oct 2016

### Mission IBPS PO 2016 - Practice Quantitative Aptitude Questions with Detailed Solutions

Mission IBPS PO 2016 - Practice Quantitative Aptitude Questions:
Dear Readers, Important Practice Aptitude Questions for IBPS PO and Upcoming Exams was given here with Solutions. Aspirants those who are preparing for the examination can use this.
Directions (Q. 1-5): Find the missing number in the following number series:
1).15, 18, 21.6, 25.92, ?
a)    31.104
b)    31.014
c)    31.114
d)    30.114
e)    30.004

2).210, 154, 182, 168, 175,171.5, ?
a)    172.75
b)    173.25
c)    172.25
d)    173.75
e)    174.75

3).72, 115, 244, ?, 760, 1147
a)    501
b)    431
c)    473
d)    459
e)    445

4).188, 212, 236, ?, 268, 284
a)    260
b)    256
c)    252
d)    248
e)    244

5).676, 400, 196, 64, 4, ?
a)    4
b)    36
c)    16
d)    -4
e)    -16

Directions (Q. 6-10): what value will come in place of question mark(?) in the following questions?
6). (512)8 × (1024)2 ÷ (256)? = 418
a)    7
b)    9
c)    5
d)    3
e)    6

7).53 × 47 + 64 × 56 -72 × 68 = ?
a)    1221
b)    1403
c)    1249
d)    1337
e)    1179

8).172 + 212 + 252 + 29 2 = ?
a)    2076
b)    2196
c)    2336
d)    2168
e)    2244

9).57% of 400 + 23% of 700 + 32% of 1100 – 28% of 1300 = ?
a)    401
b)    389
c)    377
d)    364
e)    352

10).13.5 × 14 + 22.5 × 18 – 4.7 × 30 = ?
a)    405
b)    423
c)    435
d)    453
e)    481

1)a  2)b  3)d  4)e  5)c  6)a  7)e  8)b  9)c  10)d

Solution:

1).The series is a geometric progression with a common ratio 1.2. Hence the next term is 25.92 × 1.2 = 31.104

2).Starting from the third term, every term is the average of the previous two terms.
Hence the next term is (175 + 171.5)/ 2 = 173.25

3). The pattern is:
72+43×1=115, 115+43×3=244, 244+43×5=459, 459+43×7=760, 760+43×9=1147

4).The pattern is 47×4=188, 53×4=212, 59×4=236, 61×4=244, 67×4=268, 71×4=284
47, 53, 59, 61, 69 and 71 are consecutive prime numbers.

5). The pattern is 262, 202, 142, 82, 22, (-4)2

6).(29)8 × (210)2 ÷(28)?=236
=>272 × 220  ÷ 28×? = 236
=>28×?  = 272+20-36=256
=> ? = 7

7). ?=(50+3)(50-3)+(60+4)(60-4)-(70+2)(70-2)
=502 - 32 + 602 - 42 -702 + 22
=2500 – 9 +3600 -16 - 4900 + 4
=1179

8). ? = 289 +441 +625 + 841=2196

9). ? = 57×4 + 23×7 + 32×11 - 28×13
= 228 + 161 + 352 – 364 = 377