# IBPS Clerk/RRB 2016 – Practice Quantitative Aptitude Questions

IBPS Clerk/RRB 2016 – Practice Quantitative Aptitude Questions (Number Series& Simplification) Set-51:
Dear Readers, Important Practice Aptitude Questions for IBPS Clerk and Upcoming Exams was given here with Solutions. Aspirants those who are preparing for the examination can use this.

Are You preparing for Bank exams 2019? Start your preparation with Free Mock test Series.

Directions (Q. 1-5): What should come in place of question mark(?) in the following number series?
1).65  219  517 1007 1737  ?
a)   2213
b)   2000
c)   2755
d)   2765
e)   2855

2).561 642 763 932 1157 ?
a)   1446
b)   1326
c)   1482
d)   1246
e)   None of these

3).1524 1443 1394 ? 1360 1359
a)   1303
b)   1218
c)   1359
d)   1369
e)   1329

4).5  13  58 357 2868  ?
a)   25823
b)   28695
c)   29548
d)   28545
e)   27695

5).?  61 211 505 991 1717
a)   6
b)   5 .
c)   8
d)   7
e)   10

Directions (Q. 6-10): What approximate value should come in place of question mark (?) in the following questions? (Note: You are not expected to calculate the exact value.)
6).512.01 x 412.99 รท 119 =?
a)   1720
b)   1740
c)   1845
d)   1775
e)   None of these

7).1699.99 x 299.88 รท 59.9 -1498 + 3745 = ?
a)   10980
b)   11700
c)   11000
d)   10750
e)   9800

8).(13.96)2 + (16.23)2 + (17.26)2 โ 32.95 = ?
a)   790
b)   720
c)   840
d)   780
e)   680

9).1624.98 x 29.92 + 468.75 =?
a)   49290
b)   48220
c)   47220
d)   46365
e)   None of these

10).8499.99 รท 375.002 x 14.996 =?
a)   360
b)   290
c)   480
d)   380
e)   340

Solutions:

1).The series is 43+1, 63+3, 83+5, 103+7, 123+9, 143=11,โฆ
So, the answer will be 2755.
2).The series is +92, +112, +132, +152, ++172
3).The Series is -92, -72, -52, -32, -12
4).The series is 5×2+3 = 13, 13×4+6, 58×6+9=357, 357×8+12,โฆ
5).The series is 23-1, 43-3, 63-5, 83-7,โฆ
6).?= 512.01x (412.99/119) = (512×413)/(17×7)
= (510×413)/ (17×7) = 30×59 = 1770 โ1775
7).?= (1700×300)/ 60 โ 1498+3745
= 510000/60 โ 1490+3745
=8500-1498+3745
= 12245 โ 1498 = 10747 โ 10750
8).? = (14)2 + (16.2)2 + (17.25)2-33
=196+262.44+297.56-33
= 756 โ 33- = 723 = 720 (Approx)
9).? = 1625 x 30 + 469
=48750 + 469 = 49219 โ 49220