# Useful Smart Tips to Solve Simplification – IBPS RRB/PO/Clerk 2017

Useful Smart Tips to Solve Simplification – IBPS RRB/PO/Clerk 2017:
Dear Readers, Here we have given the Useful Smart Tips to Solve Simplification for IBPS RRB/PO/Clerk 2017, candidates those who are preparing for the upcoming IBPS RRB/PO/Clerkย 2017 can make use of it.

Are You preparing for Bank exams 2019? Start your preparation with Free Mock test Series.

Important Parts of Simplification

• Number System
• HCF& LCM
• Square& Cube
• Fractions& Decimals
• Surds& Indices
1) 4 + 44 + 444 + 4444 + 44444 + 444444 = ?
Solution:
2) 4.4 + 44.44 + 444.444 + 4444.4444 = ?
Solution:
3) 2 รท 2 รท 2 รท 2 รท 2 รท 2 = ?
Solution:
2/ 2ร2ร2ร2ร2 = 1/16
4) 445 x 20.3% + 125 x 16.8%
a)111.35.ย ย  b) 252.25ย ย ย  c) 133.45ย ย ย  d) None of this
Solution:
Here, 20.3% becomes 20% and 16.8% becomes 17%
Now, simplify 445 x 20% + 125 x 17%
ย ย ย ย ย ย ย ย ย ย ย ย ย ย ย ย ย ย ย ย ย ย  = 89 + 21.25
ย ย ย ย ย ย ย ย ย ย ย ย ย ย ย ย ย ย ย ย ย ย  =110.25
110.25 is not the actual answer. The actual answer is 111.35. So we have reached very close to the correct answer in almost no time. This is a small calculated risk that you should be ready to take in the exam to save time.ย
Approximately that to option A = 111.35
5) 4444.764 โ 2233.993 โ 1133.667 + 3377.442
a) 4528.256ย ย b)4454.546ย ย ย  c) 5876.02ย ย  d) None of this
Solution:
4444.764ย ~ย 4445
2233.993ย ~ย 2234
1133.667ย ~ย 1134
3377.442ย ~ย 3377
Now simplify
4445 โ 2234 โ 1134 + 3377
=ย 4454
Had we done all the calculations, we would have reached the answer: 4454.546
Instead we saved time and just checked which option is closest to our approximate answer.
Approximately that to option B = 4454.546
6) 530 ร 20.3% + 225 ร 16.8% = x
a) 123.27ย ย  b) 145.39ย ย  c) 165.49ย ย ย  d) 186.59
Solution:
Convert decimal to nearest value
20.3% –> 20%
16.8% –> 17%
Now Simplify that
530 ร20% + 225 ร 17% = x
106 + 38.25 = x
144.25 = x
Approximately that to option B = 145.39
7) (13.96)2โ (15.03)2 + (18.09)2 โ 32.65 = ?
a) 223ย ย ย  b) 264ย ย ย  c) 334ย ย  d) 354ย ย
Solution:
Convert decimal to nearest number
(13.96)2–> (14)2
(15.03)2–> (15)2
(18.09)2–> (18)2
(32.65) –> 33
Now simplify that
(14)2– (15)2– (18)2ย – 33
196 โ 225 + 324 โ 33
= 262ย
Approximately that to option B = 264
8) 111111111 ร 111111111 = ?
Solution:
No of digits in multiplier = 9
Write in ascending order from left side like this:
987654321
and now 9-1=8
write it in descending order just after it
12345678
now you will get like this:
12345678987654321
hence
111111111ร111111111 = 12345678987654321
9) ( 2.3 + 3.3 ) [ ( 2.3)2 – 2.3ร3.3 + (3.3)2 ] = ?
a) 48.104ย ย b) 47.104ย ย c) 47.204ย ย d) 48.204ย ย e) None of these
Solution:
(a3+ b3)=(a+b) (a2-ab+b2)
a = 2.3, b = 3.3;
(a)3= 12.167, (b)3 = 35.937
(a3+b3)=48.104
10) 3(2/5) + 1(2/9) = 4(4/5)- ?
a) 8/45ย ย ย  b) 7/47ย ย ย  c)4/45ย ย ย ย  d) 5/81ย ย ย  e)None of these
Solution:
Step 1:
First let’s arrange the values in order-ย
? = 4(4/5) -3 (2/5) – 1(2/9)
Step 2:
Then split integer and fraction in the way given below-
? = 4 + 4/5 – 3 – 2/5 -1 – 2/9
Step 3:
Then perform the calculation on the integers-
4 – 3 – 1 = 0
Step 4:
Then simplify the fraction-
4/5 – 2/5 -2/9 = (36 – 18 – 10) / 45 = 8/45
Therefore, the answer is option A: 8/45
Find Square of any number within 10 seconds
Today i am going to share an interesting vedic maths trick. At first you will find it difficult but with practice, you will be able to find square of any number within 10 seconds.
ย
Square numbers ending in 25
3252= 105625
1)ย 325 = 3_25 => 3
2) Square the number from Step 1:- 32 = 9
3) Divide the number from Step 1 by 2:- 3/2 =1.5
4) Add Step 2 and Step 3:- 9 + 1.5 = 10.5
5) Multiply the number from Step 4 by 10:- 10.5 * 10 =105
6) Write the number 625 (square of 25) next to the result from Step 5:- 105_625 = 105625
Square Numbers Ending in 5
352= 1225
1) Multiply the first digit by the first digit plus one:- 3 * ( 3 + 1 ) = 12
2) Write the number 25 (square of 5) next to the result from Step 1:- 1225
Square numbers between 10 and 19
142= 196
1) Add the number to the ones digit: 14 + 4 = 18
2) Multiply the number from Step 1 by 10:- 18 *10 = 180
3) Square the ones digit number 42 = 16
4) Add Step 2 and Step 3:- 180 + 16 = 196
If You Have Any Queries, Feel Free to Ask us in the below Comment Section.
Check Below for More Aptitude Shortcuts and Tricks:
ยทย ย ย ย ย ย ย ย BEST 5 Shortcuts on Boats and Stream Problems
ยทย ย ย ย ย ย ย ย TOP 10 Important Shortcuts on Profit And Loss Problems
ยทย ย ย ย ย ย ย ย Aptitude Shortcuts and Mind Tricks for Problems on Ages
ยทย ย ย ย ย ย ย ย Five Most Important Shortcuts for Time Speed Distance
ยทย ย ย ย ย ย ย ย Useful Shortcuts for Simple Interest& Compound Interest
ยทย ย ย ย ย ย ย ย TOP 10 Shortcuts for Percentage Problems

/ 5. Reviews

IBPSGuide Recommends Affairs Cloud Current affairs PDF

Free Online Mock Tests